EP1662296 - OPTICAL CONTROL DEVICE AND OPTICAL CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURO, Mikio 2-1-1-507, Nishi-Okamoto, Higashi-Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6580073 / JP | 02 /
HAZAMA, Hisanao 659-1513, Hiraokacho-Futamata Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 6750111 / JP | 03 /
TAKATANI, Yoshiaki 2-1-1-905, Nishi-Okamoto, Higa shi-Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6580073 / JP | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772599.9 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004JP12643 | Priority number, date | JP20030314820 | 05.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003314820 | [2006/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005024497 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662296 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01, G02F1/13, G02B21/00, G01N21/64 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
G02F1/139 (EP,US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G02B27/288 (EP,US);
G02F2203/05 (EP,US);
G02F2203/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE STEUEREINRICHTUNG UND OPTISCHES STEUERVERFAHREN | [2006/22] | English: | OPTICAL CONTROL DEVICE AND OPTICAL CONTROL METHOD | [2006/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE OPTIQUE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2005 | Translation filed | 21.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 01.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS55126213 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]JPH1124032 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2002035980 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003156709 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH11504441 ; | [A]JPH11515117 ; | [A]JPH11326860 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2002289397 (MOCHIZUKI TAKAYASU); | [A]JP2002062261 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPH1195120 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [AE]JP2003270551 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [AE]JP2003272892 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) | [A] - KAMINARI, F. ET AL., "Adaptive Seigyo ni yoru Femtosecond Laser Pulse Seikei to Hikari Reiki Katei eno Oyo", THE REVIEW OF LASER ENGINEERING, (20000815), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 479 - 485, XP002985750 | [A] - STEVENSON, R.M. ET AL., "Binary-phase zone plate arrays for the generation of uniform focal profiles", OPTICS LETTERS, (19940315), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 363 - 365, XP000434786 |