EP1659065 - ARTICLE PACKAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/21] | ARTICLE STORAGE DEVICE | ||
[2009/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MURAHARU SEISAKUSHO 17-19, Onodai 5-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-0011 / JP | For all designated states Niikura Scales Co., Ltd. 2, Kandatsukasa-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MURAHARU SEISAKUSHO 17-19, Onodai 5-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-0011 / JP | ||
For all designated states Niikura Scales Co., Ltd. 2, Kandatsukasa-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Toshiyuki 17-19, Ohnodai 5-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0011 / JP | 02 /
Niikura, Motonari c/o Niikura Scales Co., Ltd. 2, Kandatsukasa-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | [2009/18] |
Former [2006/21] | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Toshiyuki 17-19, Ohnodai 5-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
Niikura, Motonari, c/o Niikura Scales Co., Ltd. 2, Kandatsukasa-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772661.7 | 26.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004JP12705 | Priority number, date | JP20030302744 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003302744 | [2006/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005021386 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659065 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1659065 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B67/04, B65B67/12 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
B65B67/1266 (EP,US);
A47F13/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINPACKVORRICHTUNG FÜR ARTIKEL | [2009/14] | English: | ARTICLE PACKAGING DEVICE | [2009/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMPAQUETAGE D'ARTICLES | [2009/14] |
Former [2006/21] | ARTIKELLAGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2006/21] | ARTICLE STORAGE DEVICE | ||
Former [2006/21] | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ARTICLES | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | Translation filed | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3468100 (RUBEL JAY E) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0657357 (MURAHARU SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]US5551219 (WEI YAO-MING [TW]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH06298232 (OHASHI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JPH0733809U | by applicant | US5512219 |