EP1672093 - FILM-FORMING APPARATUS AND FILM-FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | For all designated states SAMUKAWA, Seiji 3-52, Aza Yoshinariyama, Aoba-ku Imosawa Sendai-shi, Miyagi 9893212 / JP | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUKAWA, Seiji 3-52, Azayoshinariyama Imosawa, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 989-3212 / JP | 02 /
NOZAWA, Toshihisa c/o Tokyo Electron AT Limited 1-8, Fuso-cho Amagasaki City Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | [2013/28] |
Former [2006/25] | 01 /
SAMUKAWA, Seiji 3-52, Azayoshinariyama Imosawa, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 989-3212 / JP | ||
02 /
NOZAWA, Toshihisa c/o Tokyo Electron AT Limited 1-8, Fuso-cho Amagasaki City Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04773039.5 | 14.09.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004JP13357 | Priority number, date | JP20030325004 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003325004 | [2006/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005028703 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672093 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672093 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, H01L21/31 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
C23C16/455 (KR);
C23C16/452 (EP,US);
C23C16/5096 (EP,US);
C23C16/511 (EP,US);
H01J37/32357 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR);
H01L21/31 (KR);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3145 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/52] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FILMBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FILMBILDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/25] | English: | FILM-FORMING APPARATUS AND FILM-FORMING METHOD | [2006/25] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE FILMS | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2006 | Translation filed | 15.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | GB | 10.10.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/24] | IT | 10.07.2013 | |
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | NL | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4563367 (SHERMAN ARTHUR [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 49 - line 68; figures 4-7 * * column 8, line 44 - line 68 *; | [A]US6162323 (KOSHIMIZU CHISHIO [JP]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]US2001042512 (XU GE [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] - [0030] - [0034] - [0045] , [0046]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [X]US2002006478 (YUDA KATSUHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0096]; figures 2-4 *; | [XA]US2002068458 (CHIANG TONY P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-12,17 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * [A] 3-8,13-16; | [XA]US2003118748 (KUMAGAI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 11,13,14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-10,12,15-17 | International search | [X]JP2002016056 (NEC CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH06260434 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06236850 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2000144421 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | [X]JP2000345349 (ANELVA CORP) | Examination | EP1300878 | EP1300875 | by applicant | US2001042512 | US2002068458 | JP2002539326 |