EP1679910 - SIGNALING METHOD, SYSTEM, BASE STATION AND MOBILE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jinsock, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1088001 / JP | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04773625.1 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004JP14701 | Priority number, date | JP20030358461 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003358461 | [2006/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039209 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679910 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38, H04L12/56 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/31] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEICHENGABEVERFAHREN, SYSTEM, BASISSTATION UND MOBILSTATION | [2006/28] | English: | SIGNALING METHOD, SYSTEM, BASE STATION AND MOBILE STATION | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE SIGNALISATION, SYSTEME, STATION DE BASE ET STATION MOBILE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | Translation filed | 04.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1209936 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009], [0060] - [0077]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002075805 (GUPTA DEV V [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013], [0229] - [0278]; figures 3, 28-30 *; | [A]US6452915 (JORGENSEN JACOB W [US]) [A] 1-18* column 3, lines 30-61; claims 1-6; figures 1A-18 *; | [E]EP1679923 (NEC CORP [JP]) [E] 1,8,13,15-18 * paragraphs [0004], [0015] - [0031], [0045] - [0056]; figures 1-7 *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Feasibility Study for Enhanced Uplink for UTRA FDD; (Release 6)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 25.896, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20030901), no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 63, XP050380446 [A] 1-18 * chapter 7, in particular section 7.1, figures 7.1.1 and 7.1.2 * | International search | [A]JP2000244521 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2001156784 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2002520939 ; | [A]JP2002281545 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003008635 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [A]JP2003163687 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |