Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7746840 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2010 | B2 | US2007076679 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003358461 | 17.10.2003 | WO2004JP14701 | 29.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4748313B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2011 | B2 | JPWO2005039209 | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003358461 | 17.10.2003 | JP2005514743 | 29.09.2004 | WO2004JP14701 | 29.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1679910 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | A4 | EP1679910 | 12.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003358461 | 17.10.2003 | WO2004JP14701 | 29.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1868227B | 19.06.2013 | B | CN1868227 | 22.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003358461 | 17.10.2003 | WO2004JP14701 | 29.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005039209 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003358461 | 17.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100816598B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2008 | B1 | KR20060120115 | 24.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003358461 | 17.10.2003 |