EP1672395 - POLARIZING ELEMENT AND OPTICAL SYSTEM INCLUDING POLARIZING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalux Co. Ltd. 2-1-7, Yamazaki Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-0001 / JP | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Makoto, c/o NALUX CO., LTD. 2-1-7, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP | 02 /
FUJIMURA, Kayoko, c/o NALUX CO., LTD. 2-1-7, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04773720.0 | 05.10.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004JP14991 | Priority number, date | JP20030348518 | 07.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003348518 | [2006/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005036218 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672395 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672395 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G11B7/135 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
G11B7/1356 (EP,US);
G02B5/1809 (EP,US);
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2007/02] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISIERENDES ELEMENT UND OPTISCHES SYSTEM MIT POLARISIERENDEM ELEMENT | [2006/25] | English: | POLARIZING ELEMENT AND OPTICAL SYSTEM INCLUDING POLARIZING ELEMENT | [2006/25] | French: | ELEMENT POLARISANT ET SYSTEME OPTIQUE COMPRENANT CET ELEMENT POLARISANT | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2006 | Translation filed | 04.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.12.2010 | [2011/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO0057215 (MEMS OPTICAL INC [US]) [Y] 16-18 * abstract * * page 5, line 6 - line 20 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 13 * * page 9, line 2 - line 12 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 16 * * the whole document *[A] 5,6; | [X]US2003017580 (CUNNINGHAM BRIAN T [US], et al) [X] 1,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0040] - [0047] - [0053] - [0055] - [0112] - [0114]; figures 3,4,21 *; | [XY]EP1347315 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3,4,7-15 * paragraphs [0143] - [0166] - [0183] , [0202] , [0265] - [0271] - [0280]; figures 4,13,20,21 * * the whole document * [Y] 16-18; | [XY] - TYAN R-C ET AL, "POLARIZING BEAM SPLITTER BASED ON THE ANISOTROPIC SPECTRAL REFLECTIVITY CHARACTERISTIC OF FORM-BIREFRINGENT MULTILAYER GRATINGS", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19960515), vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 761 - 763, XP000589963 [X] 1,2,12 * pages 761,762; figures 1a,1b * * the whole document * [Y] 17,18 | International search | [A]JP2002540446 ; | [A]JP2002258034 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [XP]JP2004252130 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | US2003017580 | EP1347315 | - TYAN R-C ET AL., "Polarizing beam splitter based on the anisotropic spectral reflectivity characteristic of form-birefringent multilayer gratings", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (19960515), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 761 - 763, XP000589963 |