EP1678969 - RECORD CARRIER, SYSTEM, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONDITIONAL ACCESS TO DATA STORED ON THE RECORD CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOTA, Kaoru 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
OHMORI, Motoji 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04773722.6 | 05.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004JP14993 | Priority number, date | JP20030356072 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003356072 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039218 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1678969 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
G06F21/78 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/445 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER, SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM FÜR BEDINGTEN ZUGRIFF AUF AUF DEM AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER GESPEICHERTE DATEN | [2006/28] | English: | RECORD CARRIER, SYSTEM, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONDITIONAL ACCESS TO DATA STORED ON THE RECORD CARRIER | [2006/28] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME D'ACCES CONDITIONNEL A DES DONNEES STOCKEES SUR LEDIT SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19645937 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [A] 5,8,16,19 * column 5, line 1 - line 30 * * column 6, line 7 - line 9 *; | [A]FR2765985 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 4,15 * page 8, line 1 - line 19 *; | [X]GB2327570 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]) [X] 1-41 * page 12, line 1 - page 17, line 26 * * page 19, line 3 - line 10 *; | [X]EP1001640 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,21,22,35,38-41* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figure 3 *; | [A]US6216014 (PROUST PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 13 * column 14, line 10 - line 19; figure 7 *; | [A]DE10135527 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 6-9,17-20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018]; figure 2 * | by applicant | GB2327570 | EP1001640 |