EP1638654 - FOOT PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A FIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Han Ji Corporation 4F, Jungwon Building 1566-8, Seocho-3dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Song, Dong-Suk 315-1 Byeongcheon-ri, Byeongcheon-myeon Cheonan-city Chungcheongnam-do, 330-861 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Dong-Suk 315-1, Byeongcheon-ri, Byeongcheon-myeon Cheonan-city, Chungcheongnam-do, 330-861 / KR | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Molnia, David Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04774016.2 | 25.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004KR01547 | Priority number, date | KR20030020516 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: KR 2003020516 | KR20040017787 | 23.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004017787 | [2006/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005000049 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638654 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638654 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/12, A63B71/08 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A63B71/1225 (EP,US);
A43B13/22 (EP,US);
A43B19/00 (EP,US);
A43B7/26 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSSSCHUTZ BEI KÄMPFEN | [2006/13] | English: | FOOT PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A FIGHT | [2006/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DU PIED POUR SPORT DE COMBAT | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | Translation filed | 20.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | BE | 02.09.2009 | BG | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SE | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3949493 (RHEE JHOON GOO); | [X]US4497070 (CHO SOO S [US]); | [A]US5211672 (ANDUJAR EDWARD M [US]) | International search | [A]JPS648986 (IKEDA MOHANDO CO); | [A]JPH03279401 (KOMURA YOSHITAKA); | [A]JPH0857106 (YASHIMA SEIICHI); | [A]JPH11206946 (MARUEE KNIT KK); | [A]JP2002201501 (MATSUMOTOYA KK) |