EP1668933 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTABLISHING RADIO BEARER FOR POINT-TO-MULTIPOINT MULTIMEDIA SERVICE IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Young, Dae 370-43, Deokpung 2-dong Hanam-si Gyeonggi-do 465-804 / KR | 02 /
YI, Seung, June 101-1203, Daesung Unid 1641-3, Seocho 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-880 / KR | 03 /
CHUN, Sung, Duck 202. 1430-17, Sillim 5-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul, 151-891 / KR | [2010/48] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
LEE, Young, Dae 370-43, Deokpung 2-dong Hanam-si Gyeonggi-do 465-804 / KR | ||
02 /
YI, Seung, June 101-1203, Daesung Unid 1641-3, Seocho 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-880 / KR | |||
03 /
CHUN, Sung, Duck 202, 1430-17, Sillim 5-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul, 151-891 / KR | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04774742.3 | 30.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004KR02500 | Priority number, date | KR20030067517 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: KR 2003067517 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005031985 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668933 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668933 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H04W72/30 (EP,US);
H04B7/24 (KR);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W36/0007 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/245 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FUNKTRÄGERS FÜR EINEN PUNKT-ZU-MEHRPUNKT-MULTIMEDIA-DIENST IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2006/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTABLISHING RADIO BEARER FOR POINT-TO-MULTIPOINT MULTIMEDIA SERVICE IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2006/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UN RELEVEMENT RADIOGONIOMETRIQUE POUR SERVICE MULTIMEDIA POINT A MULTIPOINT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 06.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | IT | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | PT | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | IE | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | LU | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
LU | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
LU | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
LU | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
LU | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0928119 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [A]EP1077539 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); |