EP1662952 - PREPARATION OF A BEVERAGE SUITABLE FOR CONSUMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE B.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNITEL, Joseph, Theodoor Fahrenheit 12 NL-3454 KJ De Meern / NL | 02 /
STEENHOF, Vincent, Jan Maastrichtseweg 54 NL-5215 AD 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2014/47] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/23] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04774897.5 | 23.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004NL00590 | Priority number, date | NL20031024160 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: NL 1024160 | [2006/23] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018394 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662952 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662952 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1662952 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/06 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A47J31/0678 (EP,NO,US);
A47J31/0647 (EP,NO,US);
A47J31/4496 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG EINES FÜR DEN VERZEHR GEEIGNETEN GETRÄNKS | [2006/23] | English: | PREPARATION OF A BEVERAGE SUITABLE FOR CONSUMATION | [2006/23] | French: | PREPARATION D'UNE BOISSON CONSOMMABLE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2004 | Translation filed | 10.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2010
02.11.2010
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2010
Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | 29.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.03.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.10.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 17.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/15] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 20.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5150645 (SCHIETTECATTE PATRICE J C [FR]) [A] 1,20,21,23-28,30-32,34-41,43,44 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 13 * * figure 2 *; | [DA]EP0756844 (JACOBS SUCHARD AG [CH]) [DA] 1 * column 6, line 43 - line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO03026470 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL], et al) [X] 20-23,25-28,34-37,39,43-45 * page 4, line 17 - page 8, line 19 * * page 9, line 3 - line 15 * * figures 1e,1f,2b,3b * [A] 1 [I] 30-32; | [PX]NL1020837C (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [PX] 1,2,5,7-10,14,16-25,27,28,32,34,35,43-45 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 27 * * figures 1,2A,2B,2C *; | [PX]EP1398279 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [PX] 1,2,5,16-18,20-22,25,34-36,43-45 * column 13, line 11 - line 13 * * column 13, line 31 - line 55 ** figure 11 * | by applicant | EP0756844 | EP0904717 | EP1317200 | NL1020833C | Opposition | US3450024 | US4739697 | US4834955 | EP0756844 | EP0878158 | EP1092377 | WO03026470 | WO03105641 | EP1398279 |