EP1678290 - BEVERAGES AND FOODSTUFFS RESISTANT TO LIGHT INDUCED FLAVOUR CHANGES, PROCESSES FOR MAKING THE SAME, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPARTING SUCH RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heineken Supply Chain B.V. Burgemeester Smeetsweg 1 2382 PH Zoeterwoude / NL | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER ARK, Richard Wim Sonneveldplein 42 NL-2548 ZH Den Haag / NL | 02 /
BLOKKER, Peter Oudegracht 4 NL-1811 CL Alkmaar / NL | 03 /
BOLSHAW, Louise Rijnsburgersingel 69 NL-2316 XX Leiden / NL | 04 /
BROUWER, Eric, Richard Marketentster 142 NL-2401 JT Alphen Aan De Rijn / NL | 05 /
HUGHES, Paul, Shane Doornenburg 102 NL-2261 XE Leidschendam / NL | 06 /
KESSELS, Henk Osborne Road 3b Flat 1 Ikoyi Lagos / NG | 07 /
OLIEROOK, Fred Arnold Spoelplein 34 NL-2553 CB Den Haag / NL | 08 /
VAN VEEN, Marcel Zambiapark 23 NL-2408 JN Alphen Aan De Rijn / NL | [2017/36] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
VAN DER ARK, Richard Wim Sonneveldplein 42 NL-2548 ZH Den Haag / NL | ||
02 /
BLOKKER, Peter Oudegracht 4 NL-1811 CL Alkmaar / NL | |||
03 /
BOLSHAW, Louise Rijnsburgersingel 69 NL-2316 XX Leiden / NL | |||
04 /
BROUWER, Eric, Richard Marketentster 142 NL-2401 JT Alphen Aan De Rijn / NL | |||
05 /
HUGHES, Paul, Shane Doornenburg 102 NL-2261 XE Leidschendam / NL | |||
06 /
KESSELS, Henk Osborne Road 3b Flat 1, Ikoyi Lagos / NG | |||
07 /
OLIEROOK, Fred Arnold Spoelplein 34 NL-2553 CB Den Haag / NL | |||
08 /
VAN VEEN, Marcel Zambiapark 23 NL-2408 JN Alphen Aan De Rijn / NL | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2006/28] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04774975.9 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004NL00674 | Priority number, date | WO2003NL00665 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: PCT/NL0300/665 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030919 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1678290 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678290 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12C5/04, A23G3/32, A23L2/52, A23L3/3544 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
C12C5/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (KR);
A23C9/152 (EP,US);
A23G3/32 (EP,US);
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A23L2/58 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L27/215 (EP,US);
A23L3/3544 (EP,US);
A23L5/41 (EP,US);
A23L5/42 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | C12C5/04, A23G3/32, A23L1/03, A23L3/3544 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | HR | 28.04.2006 | LT | 28.04.2006 | LV | 28.04.2006 | MK | 28.04.2006 | Title | German: | GEGENÜBER LICHTINDUZIERTEN GESCHMACKSVERÄNDERUNGEN RESISTENTE GETRÄNKE UND LEBENSMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERLEIHUNG EINER SOLCHEN RESISTENZ | [2006/28] | English: | BEVERAGES AND FOODSTUFFS RESISTANT TO LIGHT INDUCED FLAVOUR CHANGES, PROCESSES FOR MAKING THE SAME, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPARTING SUCH RESISTANCE | [2006/28] | French: | BOISSONS ET ALIMENTS RESISTANTS A DES CHANGEMENTS DE SAVEUR INDUITS PAR LA LUMIERE, PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE CES DERNIERS ET COMPOSITIONS DESTINEES A CONFERER CETTE RESISTANCE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2004 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | LU | 29.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | [2020/16] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.09.2004 | |
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.09.2004 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH230495 (R BUISMAN S GEBRANDE SUIKERPOE [NL]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [A]US3492244 (FUJIWARA SHINOBU, et al) [A] 1-36 * column 2, lines 1-17; examples 4-7 *; | [A]CH568024 (FIRMENICH & CIE) [A] 1-36 * example - *; | [A]US4303689 (WINTER MAX, et al) [A] 1-36 * columns 13-14 *; | [DA]US4389421 (PALAMAND S R) [DA] 1-36* claim 1 *; | [A]US4416700 (CLARK ALLEN V [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * examples VI-IX *; | [A]US4563365 (EMBERGER ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-36 * example 6 *; | [A]EP0212049 (WILLIAMSON D D CO INC [US]) [A] 1-36 * examples 1,3 *; | [A]EP0360007 (THURN & TAXIS FUERSTL BRAUEREI [DE]) [A] 29-36 * claims 1,21 * |