Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03030978 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03022341 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0195965 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018001047 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | US41086309 | 25.03.2009 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | US92877907 | 30.10.2007 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | US201314136930 | 20.12.2013 | US201715651957 | 17.07.2017 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US45666103 | 06.06.2003 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9339621 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2016 | B2 | US2016051785 | 25.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US57022604 | 20.08.2004 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9144655 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2015 | B2 | US2014318548 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US57022604 | 20.08.2004 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9707368 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B2 | US2014230813 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | US41086309 | 25.03.2009 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | US92877907 | 30.10.2007 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | US201314136930 | 20.12.2013 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US45666103 | 06.06.2003 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8613279 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2013 | B2 | US2009223520 | 10.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | US41086309 | 25.03.2009 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | US92877907 | 30.10.2007 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US45666103 | 06.06.2003 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8602029 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2013 | B2 | US2008047557 | 28.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | US92877907 | 30.10.2007 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US45666103 | 06.06.2003 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8714157 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2007062536 | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8100126 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2012 | B2 | US2006237018 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | US36800406 | 03.03.2006 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US45666103 | 06.06.2003 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004244804 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004244800 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88644304 | 07.07.2004 | US26887002 | 10.10.2002 | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | NZ51954102 | 12.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004065327 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | US88139401 | 14.06.2001 | US67519803 | 30.09.2003 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7017576 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2006 | B2 | US2004035428 | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | US64643403 | 22.08.2003 | US88163301 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US7227102 | 07.02.2002 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6951218 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2005 | B2 | US2003217746 | 27.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003196659 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US45666103 | 06.06.2003 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003154978 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | US29795103 | 25.03.2003 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11607514 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2023 | B2 | US2021128861 | 06.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816010827 | 18.06.2018 | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US202117149300 | 14.01.2021 | US202017061407 | 01.10.2020 | US57022606 | 01.11.2006 | US202016871683 | 11.05.2020 | US201615156073 | 16.05.2016 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | US201715789268 | 20.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11179532 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | B2 | US2021085905 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816010827 | 18.06.2018 | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US202017061407 | 01.10.2020 | US57022606 | 01.11.2006 | US202016871683 | 11.05.2020 | US201615156073 | 16.05.2016 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | US201715789268 | 20.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10828448 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B2 | US2020268996 | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816010827 | 18.06.2018 | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US57022606 | 01.11.2006 | US202016871683 | 11.05.2020 | US201615156073 | 16.05.2016 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | US201715789268 | 20.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10765826 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2019143064 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816010827 | 18.06.2018 | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US57022606 | 01.11.2006 | US201615156073 | 16.05.2016 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | US201715789268 | 20.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10034994 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | B2 | US2018036502 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US57022604 | 20.08.2004 | US201615156073 | 16.05.2016 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | US201715789268 | 20.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10004865 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2018 | B2 | US2016310687 | 27.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | US201414270200 | 05.05.2014 | US201514832271 | 21.08.2015 | US57022604 | 20.08.2004 | US201615156073 | 16.05.2016 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3962374B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2007 | B2 | JP2005501669 | 20.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002095751 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4639003B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2011 | B2 | JP2002028240 | 29.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3838323 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2023 | B1 | EP3838323 | 23.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | EP04775120 | 20.08.2004 | EP19195201 | 20.08.2004 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3626293 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B1 | EP3626293 | 25.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | EP04775120 | 20.08.2004 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1905475 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | B1 | EP1905475 | 16.04.2008 | A3 | EP1905475 | 02.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | EP01114354 | 13.06.2001 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1425060 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2008 | B1 | EP1425060 | 02.02.2005 | A4 | EP1425060 | 09.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1306098 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2011 | B1 | EP1306098 | 15.10.2003 | A3 | EP1306098 | 02.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NZ51497201 | 23.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1302212 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2004 | A3 | EP1302212 | 16.04.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | NZ51954102 | 12.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1289590 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | B1 | EP1289590 | 20.06.2007 | A4 | EP1289590 | 12.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163924 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2008 | B1 | EP1163924 | 19.06.2002 | A3 | EP1163924 | 19.12.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163923 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2005 | B1 | EP1163923 | 31.07.2002 | A3 | EP1163923 | 19.12.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU784321B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2006 | B2 | AU5187701 | 20.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU783749B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2005 | B2 | AU5187601 | 20.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004268479B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2008 | B2 | AU2004268479 | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002334470B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2005 | B2 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002302002B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | B2 | Priority number | Date | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | AU2001267947 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001267947B | Global Dossier | 15.01.2004 | B2 | AU6794701 | 24.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU785331B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | B2 | AU1543202 | 07.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | AU1543202 | 06.02.2002 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | AU5187701 | 13.06.2001 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1663366 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2019 | B1 | EP1663366 | 09.01.2013 | A4 | EP1663366 | 07.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | WO2004NZ00194 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT500484 | 15.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE309835T | 15.12.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE415182T | 15.12.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0212453 | 22.06.2021 | B8 | BR0212453 | 22.10.2013 | B1 | BR0212453 | 19.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2350351 | 25.11.2008 | C | CA2350351 | 14.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2350356 | 08.09.2009 | C | CA2350356 | 14.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370995 | 17.08.2010 | C | CA2370995 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2407118 | 10.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | NZ51954102 | 12.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2413938 | 15.05.2007 | C | CA2413938 | 20.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ51052001 | 12.03.2001 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2457277 | 24.11.2009 | C | CA2457277 | 20.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1553820B | 18.04.2012 | B | CN1553820 | 08.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60114929T | 29.06.2006 | T2 | DE60114929D1 | 22.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60132734T | 05.03.2009 | T2 | DE60132734D1 | 27.03.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60230048D1 | 08.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | NZ0200180 | 13.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2178980T | 16.06.2008 | T3 | ES2178980T | 16.01.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2250263T | 16.04.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2318062T | 01.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2319832 | 12.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2370162T | 13.12.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NZ51497201 | 23.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2657501T | 05.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ508219 | 25.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ514972 | 28.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ51497201 | 23.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10463828 | 05.11.2019 | B2 | US2004255950 | 23.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0200212 | 10.10.2002 | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6615834 | 09.09.2003 | B2 | US2002005201 | 17.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6662803 | 16.12.2003 | B2 | US2002014241 | 07.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6789541 | 14.09.2004 | B2 | US2003000533 | 02.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | US88163301 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US7227102 | 07.02.2002 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7905232 | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2003047185 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003062048 | 03.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | NZ51954102 | 12.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6832610 | 21.12.2004 | B2 | US2003066531 | 10.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | NZ51954102 | 12.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003089373 | 15.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ0100110 | 14.06.2001 | NZ51475001 | 10.10.2001 | NZ51954102 | 12.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6701926 | 09.03.2004 | B2 | US2003111080 | 19.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ50821800 | 16.11.2000 | US27831702 | 23.10.2002 | NZ50515600 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50821900 | 16.11.2000 | NZ51418401 | 13.09.2001 | US88163301 | 14.06.2001 | NZ50843300 | 27.11.2000 | NZ51497201 | 23.10.2001 | NZ50515500 | 14.06.2000 | NZ50903900 | 20.12.2000 | US7227102 | 07.02.2002 | NZ50515400 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005021075 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NZ52802903 | 03.09.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP3626293 | EP3838323 |