EP1680523 - AUSTENITIC FE-CR-NI ALLOY FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE USE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÖNSSON, Bo Bildhuggarvägen 5 S-724 71 Västeras / SE | 02 /
HELANDER, Thomas Tortuna Valsberg S-725 96 Västeras / SE | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/19] |
Former [2006/29] | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04775393.4 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004SE01288 | Priority number, date | SE20030002611 | 02.10.2003 Original published format: SE 0302611 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031018 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680523 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1680523 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, C22C19/05, C22C38/40 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
C22C19/058 (EP,SE,US);
C22C19/05 (KR);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C22C19/055 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/40 (EP,KR,SE,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/29] | C22C19/05, C22C38/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | AUSTENITISCHE FE-CR-NI-LEGIERUNG FÜR DEN HOCHTEMPERATUREINSATZ | [2006/29] | English: | AUSTENITIC FE-CR-NI ALLOY FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE USE. | [2006/29] | French: | ALLIAGE AUSTENITIQUE FE-CR-NI POUR USAGE HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 30.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11190128.6 / EP2426226 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2004 | AT | 08.08.2012 | BE | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | IE | 08.09.2012 | LU | 08.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
LU | 08.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06264193 ; | [A]JPS61179833 ; | [A]EP0386730 (VDM NICKEL TECH [DE]); | [A]EP0531775 (KRUPP VDM GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE19629977 (SCHMIDT & CLEMENS GMBH & CO ED [DE]); | [A]US5753177 (MORINAGA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS5785958 |