EP1664618 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND MAINTAINING A DESIRED PRESSURE/FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lagafors Fabriks AB Box 5 312 21 Laholm / SE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Knut DTU Bygning 358 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Nilsson, Lennart Lennart Nilsson Patentbyra AB Ljungsjövägen 36 311 95 Falkenberg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Nilsson, Lennart Lennart Nilsson Patentbyra AB, Ljungsjövägen 31 311 95 Falkenberg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04775422.1 | 14.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004SE01318 | Priority number, date | SE20030002470 | 16.09.2003 Original published format: SE 0302470 | [2006/23] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006019341 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664618 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664618 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F17D3/01 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
F04B9/1176 (EP);
F04B9/1172 (EP);
F04B2205/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN UND AUFRECHTERHALTEN EINES GEWÜNSCHTEN DRUCKS/STROMS | [2006/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND MAINTAINING A DESIRED PRESSURE/FLOW | [2006/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR GENERER ET POUR MAINTENIR UNE PRESSION/ECOULEMENT VOULU | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2004 | Translation filed | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 07.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | BE | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | PL | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | GB | 14.09.2009 | IE | 14.09.2009 | LU | 14.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | FR | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 14.01.2009 | |
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4597406 (LOISEAU GERARD [FR], et al); | [A]US5832948 (SCHELL DANIEL [US]); | [A]US6234759 (HENNEL EWALD [DE], et al) |