EP1660755 - PORTABLE, SURFACE-MOUNTED WELL PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McEdwards, Donald George 1025 Hearst-Willits Road Willits, CA 95490 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04775944.4 | 24.05.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US13961 | Priority number, date | US20030622620 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: US 622620 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005017354 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660755 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660755 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/00, F04B47/02 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
F04B47/02 (EP,US);
F04B9/02 (EP,US);
F16H23/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | E21B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE, OBERFLÄCHENMONTIERTE BOHRLOCHPUMPE | [2006/22] | English: | PORTABLE, SURFACE-MOUNTED WELL PUMP | [2006/22] | French: | POMPE DE PUITS PORTATIVE, MONTEE EN SURFACE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | LU | 24.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
LU | 24.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
LU | 24.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3405563 (WHISNER WILLIAM O) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US6164936 (DJELOUAH SALAH [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 3-33 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2496688 (ARMSTRONG WERNER E); | [A]US2702025 (RAY BACCHI); | [A]US3359809 (SPENDER DONALD L); | [A]US6474962 (ALLEN PETER B [US], et al) | by applicant | US3405563 | US6164936 |