EP1656656 - ILLUMINATED LED STREET SIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gelcore LLC 6180 Halle Drive Valley View, OH 44125-4635 / US | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEAN, Pare 1940 Onesime Gagnon Lachine, Quebec H8T 3M6 / CA | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Simcox, Michael Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Simcox, Michael Thomas D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04776124.2 | 27.05.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004US16561 | Priority number, date | US20030644412 | 20.08.2003 Original published format: US 644412 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005020188 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1656656 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/04 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
G09F13/22 (EP,US);
G09F13/14 (EP,US);
G09F13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTETES LED-STRASSENSCHILD | [2006/20] | English: | ILLUMINATED LED STREET SIGN | [2006/20] | French: | PLAQUE DE RUE ECLAIREE PAR DIODE ELECTROLUMINESCENTE | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/11] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4951406 (LEMIRE HONORE M [CA]) [X] 1-5,8-12,18 * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 3; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US5469347 (DUVE GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,12,18* column 3, line 26 - column 3, line 44; figure 3 *; | [XY]US5887968 (LOGAN MARK CAMPBELL [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,12,18,33 * column 5, line 59 - column 8, line 52; figures 2,3 * [Y] 23,24,32; | [XY]US6026602 (GRONDAL DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,12,18-22,25-28 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 30; figures 3,5 * [Y] 23,24; | [XY]US2003063463 (SLOAN THOMAS C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10-18,29-31 * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 5, paragraph 54; figures 3,5,9,12,14 * [Y] 32 |