EP1649223 - SUPERCRITICAL PRESSURE REGULATION OF VAPOR COMPRESSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION One Carrier Place Farmington Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse, New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIENEL, Tobias, H. 179 Walek Farms Road Manchester, CT 06040 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Booth, Catherine Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Booth, Catherine Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04776376.8 | 08.06.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US18231 | Priority number, date | US20030462423 | 16.06.2003 Original published format: US 462423 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019743 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649223 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649223 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00, F25B9/06, F25B41/04 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
F25B9/06 (EP,KR,US);
F25B9/00 (KR);
F25B1/00 (KR);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0253 (EP,US);
F25B2600/17 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2501 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1931 (EP,US);
F25B40/00 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELUNG VON ÜBERKRITISCHEM DRUCK FÜR DAMPFVERDICHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/17] | English: | SUPERCRITICAL PRESSURE REGULATION OF VAPOR COMPRESSION SYSTEM | [2006/17] | French: | REGULATION DE PRESSION SUPERCRITIQUE D'UN SYSTEME DE COMPRESSION DE VAPEUR | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | IE | 08.06.2010 | LU | 08.06.2010 | ES | 09.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 08.06.2010 | ||
LU | 08.06.2010 | ||
ES | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 08.06.2010 | ||
ES | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 08.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 08.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 08.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000234814 ; | [A]EP0787891 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,14,15 * page 2, line 55 - page 5, line 28; figures 8-10 *; | [Y]EP1046869 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,3,17 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1067342 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029]; figures 10,11 *; | [XY]US6321564 (YAMANAKA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-10,12-14,18,20,23,24 * column 3, line 45 - column 15, line 7; figures 1-22 * * column 5, line 46 - column 8, line 15; figure 6 * [Y] 2,3,17; | [PA]EP1376030 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [PA] 1-5,15* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000234814 A 20000829 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-4 * |