EP1635911 - ANTIPLAQUE BREATH FRESHENING CONSUMABLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYD, Thomas, J. 226 High Street Metuchen, NY 08840 / US | 02 /
XU, Guofeng 35 Bank Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | 03 /
GAFFAR, Abdul 89 Carter Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
VISCIO, David, B. 37 Norton Road Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04776924.5 | 23.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004US20034 | Priority number, date | US20030601473 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 601473 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005000254 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635911 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q11/00, A61K8/44 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ATEMERFRISCHENDE ESSBARE FOLIE GEGEN PLAQUE | [2006/12] | English: | ANTIPLAQUE BREATH FRESHENING CONSUMABLE FILM | [2006/12] | French: | FILM CONSOMMABLE ANTIPLAQUE RAFRAICHISSANT L'HALEINE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 20.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2012/35] | 11.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]GB1352420 (AJINOMOTO KK) [DY] 1-9 * page 1, line 11 - line 51 * * page 4, line 70 - page 5, line 23; examples 8,9; claim - *; | JPH0486712 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al); | [DY]US5874068 (ENGELMAN E ERIC [US], et al) [DY] 1-9; | [Y]WO9929289 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | JPH11255629 [ ] (SUNSTAR INC); | [DY]US6149903 (HOLT JEFFREY T [US], et al) [DY] 1-9 * column 2, line 21 - line 35 * * column 4, line 40 - line 49 *; | [DY]US6177096 (ZERBE HORST GEORG [US], et al) [DY] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y] - TSUMURA, YUKAKO ET AL, "Antiplaque anticaries dentifrice compositions containing cationic microbicides", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1997), Database accession no. 1997:716002, URL: STN, XP002309055 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [Y] - LIN, CHINLING ET AL, "Dentifrices containing cationic microbicides and nonionic surfactants", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1999), Database accession no. 1999:603432, URL: STN, XP002309056 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | GB1352420 | US5874068 | WO9929289 | US6177096 | US6419903 |