EP1636386 - METHODS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS FOR ANALYSES OF COLORECTAL CELL PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Geneststrasse 5 10829 Berlin / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Kleine Präsidentenstrasse 1 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Kastanienallee 24 10435 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOFTON-DAY, Cathy 23908 35th Avenue W. Brier, WA 98036 / US | 02 /
MODEL, Fabian 13520 Linden Avenue N.Apt. 425 Seattle, WA 98133 / US | 03 /
SLEDZIEWSKI, Andrew 17736 15th Avenue NW Shoreline, WA 98177 / US | 04 /
RUJAN, Tamas Venetastr. 7 D-13189 Berlin / DE | 05 /
LEWIN, Jörn Lützowufer 24 D-10787 Berlin / DE | 06 /
DISTLER, Juergen Hewaldstr. 2 D-10825 Berlin / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
LOFTON-DAY, Cathy 23908 35th Avenue W. Brier, WA 98036 / US | ||
02 /
MODEL, Fabian 734 Broadway Avenue E. Apt. 306 Seattle, WA 98102 / US | |||
03 /
SLEDZIEWSKI, Andrew 17736 15th Avenue NW Shoreline, WA 98177 / US | |||
04 /
RUJAN, Tamas Venetastr. 7 D-13189 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
LEWIN, Jörn Lützowufer 24 D-10787 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
DISTLER, Juergen Hewaldstr. 2 D-10825 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/25] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04777046.6 | 23.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004US20336 | Priority number, date | US20030603138 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 603138 | US20030602494 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 602494 | EP20040090072 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04090072 | EP20040090175 | 06.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04090175 | US20030679062 | 03.10.2003 Original published format: US 679062 | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/12] | US20030603138 | 23.06.2003 | |
US20030602494 | 23.06.2003 | ||
EP20040090072 | 27.02.2004 | ||
EP20040090175 | 06.05.2004 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005001141 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1636386 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636386 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND NUKLEINSÄUREN FÜR ANALYSEN VON STÖRUNGEN DER PROLIFERATION VON KOLOREKTALZELLEN | [2006/12] | English: | METHODS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS FOR ANALYSES OF COLORECTAL CELL PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS | [2006/12] | French: | METHODES ET ACIDES NUCLEIQUES POUR L'ANALYSE DE TROUBLES DE LA PROLIFERATION DE CELLULES COLORECTALES | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10174462.1 / EP2354248 | EP10174640.2 / EP2354249 | EP10174701.2 / EP2354250 | EP10174719.4 / EP2345745 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2004 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.06.2004 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.06.2004 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
GR | 06.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0224056 (MARKOWITZ SANFORD ; UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE (US); GRADY WILLIAM (US)) [X] 1,51 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,10-19,21-44; | [XA]WO03014388 (TAUBERT HEIKE ; DISTLER JUERGEN (DE); EPIGENOMICS AG (DE); MODEL FABIA) [X] 1,51 * page 8, line 32 - page 20, line 31 * * page 23, line 1 - page 24, line 8; claims 1-40; table 1 * [A] 2-8,10-19,21-44; | [X] - "Homo sapiens SLIT and NTRK-like family, member 1, mRNA (cDNA clone MGC:51091 IMAGE:4816570), complete cds.", EMBL, (20030515), Database accession no. BC051738, URL: EBI, XP002328022 [X] 46-50 * abstract * | [X] - "Homo sapiens mRNA for KIAA1910 protein, partial cds.", EMBL, (20010917), Database accession no. AB067497, URL: EBI, XP002328023 [X] 46-50 * abstract * | [XA] - TOYOTA M ET AL, "CpG island methylator phenotype in colorectal cancer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199907), vol. 96, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8681 - 8686, XP002307651 [X] 1,51 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,10-19,21-44 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.15.8681 | [XA] - VAN RIJNSOEVER M ET AL, "Characterisation of colorectal cancers showing hypermethylation at multiple CpG islands.", GUT, (200212), vol. 51, no. 6, ISSN 0017-5749, pages 797 - 802, XP002328020 [X] 1,51 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,10-19,21-44 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/gut.51.6.797 | [XA] - RASHID ASIF ET AL, "CpG island methylation in colorectal adenomas", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200109), vol. 159, no. 3, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1129 - 1135, XP002328021 [X] 1,51 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,10-19,21-44 |