EP1649000 - SEEDING PANCREATIC CELLS ON POROUS MATRICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REZANIA, Alireza 5 Dewitt Lane Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
XU, Jean 29 White Meadow Road Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 03 /
GHABRIAL, Ragae 17 Railroad Avenue Helmetta, NJ 08828 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777261.1 | 29.06.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US20865 | Priority number, date | US20030483803P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483803 P | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005005607 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1649000 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/08 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
C12N5/0062 (EP);
C12N5/0677 (EP);
C12N2533/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSETZEN VON PANKREASZELLEN AUF PORÖSEN MATRIZES | [2006/17] | English: | SEEDING PANCREATIC CELLS ON POROUS MATRICES | [2006/17] | French: | ENSEMENCEMENT DE CELLULES PANCREATIQUES SUR DES MATRICES POREUSES | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9909149 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US6306424 (VYAKARNAM MURTY N [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO02092778 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [EL]EP1466633 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [EL] 1-32* the whole document *; | [X] - PAPADAKI M ET AL, "Tissue engineering of functional cardiac muscle: Molecular, structural, and electrophysiological studies", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (200101), vol. 280, no. 1 Part 2, ISSN 0002-9513, pages H168 - H178, XP002387621 [X] 1-32 * the whole document * | [X] - TSUNG HUA YANG ET AL, "Novel cell immobilization method utilizing centrifugal force to achieve high-density hepatocyte culture in porous scaffold", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010605), vol. 55, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 379 - 386, XP002430505 [X] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4636(20010605)55:3<379::AID-JBM1026>3.0.CO;2-Z | International search | [X]US6197294 | [X] - DAR A. ET AL., "Optimization of Cardiac Cell Seeding and Distribution in 3D Porous Alginate Scaffolds", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20021105), vol. 80, no. 3, pages 305 - 312, XP003014569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10372 |