EP1769024 - RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2012/47] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HETZEL, Peter 215 Goldenstar Lane Greer, SC 29651 / US | 02 /
DOUARRE, Jean-Michel 7 Rue Claude Monet F-63170, Aubiere / FR | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2010/46] |
Former [2007/14] | Cohen, Sylvia M.F.P. MICHELIN 23, place des Carmes Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04777290.0 | 29.06.2004 | [2007/14] | WO2004US20961 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006011877 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769024 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1769024 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/18, C08L21/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
C08K5/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/18, C08L21/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/14] | C08K5/17 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND REIFEN DAMIT | [2007/14] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE COMPRISING SAME | [2007/14] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEUMATIQUE COMPRENANT CELLE-CI | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2004 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.06.2004 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.06.2004 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3391107 (STAHLY ELDON E) [X] 1-34 * table III * * column 31, line 11 - line 38 *; | [X]US3592793 (LATOS EDWIN J) [X] 1-34 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 56 * * column 3, line 62 - line 65 * * example 1 * * claim - *; | [X]US3634318 (SHOFFNER JAMES P) [X] 1-34 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 44 * * claim - *; | [X]US2002165302 (LAMBA RAKSHIT [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * example - * * claim - *; | [E]WO2005108480 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [E] 1-34* claims 42-44 * | International search | [X]US3968080 (MERTEN HELMUT LUDWIG, et al); | [X]US4764547 (HATANAKA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [X]US4767809 (WINGROVE DONALD E [US]) |