EP1639276 - TRANSMISSION CONTAINING HELICAL GEARING AND BEARING ARRANGEMENT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TIMKEN COMPANY P.O. BOX 6930 Canton, OH 44706-0930 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Gerald, P. 8587 Drummond Drive NW Massillon, OH 44646 / US | [2009/19] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
FOX, Gerald, P. 5715 Old Bridge Massillon, OH 44706 / US | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | Marles, Alan David Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777425.2 | 30.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US21265 | Priority number, date | US20030484578P | 02.07.2003 Original published format: US 484578 P | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005005866 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639276 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639276 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/02, F16C19/36 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
F16C19/364 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (EP,US);
F03D15/10 (EP,US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F16C19/54 (EP,US);
F16C33/605 (EP,US);
F16C35/067 (EP,US);
F16H57/021 (EP,US);
F05B2260/4031 (EP,US);
F16C2360/31 (EP,US);
F16C2361/61 (EP,US);
F16H1/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | F16H57/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | SCHRÄGVERZAHNUNG ENTHALTENDES GETRIEBE UND LAGERANORDNUNG DAFÜR | [2006/13] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONTAINING HELICAL GEARING AND BEARING ARRANGEMENT THEREFOR | [2006/13] | French: | TRANSMISSION CONTENANT DES ROUES HELICOIDALES ET CONFIGURATION DE PALIER ASSOCIEE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2004 | AT | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | IT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | ES | 01.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | IE | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | LU | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
LU | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 21.12.2011 | |
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH1096463 ; | [A]US3397020 (EDWARDS HERBERT C) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [A]US3420589 (GREEN WALTER F, et al) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [A]US3689127 (HAMPP WILHELM, et al) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [A]US4136916 (MUSSELMAN LAWRENCE L, et al) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [A]DE4438500 (INST MASCHINENELEMENTE UNI STU [DE]) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [A]EP1227255 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,10* figure 1 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10096463 A 19980414 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Tapered Roller Bearings-Single Row", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20030219), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20030219132344/http://www.timken.com/products/bearings/products/TaperedRollerBearings/singlerow.asp, (20041027), XP002306031 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHIEMANN S, "LAGERUNGEN DER WELLEN UND ZAHNRAEDER IN STIRNRADGETRIEBEN", ANTRIEBSTECHNIK, KRAUSSKOPF VERLAG FUR WIRTSCHAFT GMBH. MAINZ, DE, (19930701), vol. 32, no. 7, ISSN 0722-8546, pages 34,36 - 39, XP000386027 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03002891 | WO2004067998 |