EP1641910 - GLUCANASES, NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THEM AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 3550 John Hopkins Court San Diego CA 92121 / US | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 501 Westlake Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77079 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 3550 John Hopkins Court San Diego CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 501 Westlake Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77079 / US | |||
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 3550 John Hopkins Court San Diego CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 4101 Winfield Road Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | |||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states DIVERSA CORPORATION 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states DIVERSA CORPORATION 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEER, Brian 1136 Missouri Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
CALLEN, Walter 3469 Stetson Avenue San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
HEALEY, Shaun 3380 Harding Street, 7A Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 04 /
PULLIAM, Derrick, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. 3054 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/14] | 01 /
STEER, Brian 1136 Missouri Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | ||
02 /
CALLEN, Walter 3469 Stetson Avenue San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
HEALEY, Shaun 3380 Harding Street, 7A Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | |||
04 /
PULLIAM, Derrick, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. 3054 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/29] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777548.1 | 02.07.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US21492 | Priority number, date | US20030484725P | 02.07.2003 Original published format: US 484725 P | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005003319 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1641910 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641910 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24, A23K1/00, A23K1/165, A23K1/18 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
C12N9/2405 (EP,US);
A23C19/04 (US);
A23C9/1322 (US);
A23K10/14 (EP,US);
A23K20/189 (EP,US);
A23K40/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L29/10 (US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/47 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (US);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
C09K8/62 (US);
C11D3/38636 (US);
C12N11/02 (US);
C12N11/14 (US);
C12N11/16 (US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (US);
C12P19/18 (US);
C12P7/10 (US);
C12Y302/01004 (EP,US);
D21C1/00 (US);
D21C5/005 (US);
G01N33/53 (US);
G01N33/573 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
G01N2333/924 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | C07H21/04, C12P21/06, C12N9/42 | ||
Former IPC [2006/14] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | GLUCANASEN, DIESE CODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2006/14] | English: | GLUCANASES, NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THEM AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEM | [2006/14] | French: | GLUCANASES, ACIDES NUCLEIQUES LES CODANT ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 30.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP11176097.1 / EP2404928 | EP11176104.5 / EP2404929 | EP11176109.4 / EP2404930 | EP11176111.0 / EP2404931 | EP11176116.9 / EP2409981 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 02.07.2013 | LU | 02.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 20.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02099091 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [X] - PROTEIN, (19911101), Database accession no. (P23660), XP003022262 | Examination | - "Teredinibacter endoglucanase DNA.", Geneseq, (19980521), Database accession no. AAT94197, URL: EBI |