17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
12.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
17.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
11.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
18.12.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.08.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
07.08.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.03.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.01.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
22.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2014 |
First examination report |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
21.11.2008 |
Publication of international search report |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
08.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2006 |
Request for preliminary examination |
|
08.09.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
17.03.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
17.03.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
09.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|