EP1623379 - WORKFLOW SERVICES ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way, Building 8 Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZIZ, Imran 2717 Western Avenue, 4010 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 02 /
WONG, Kong-Kat c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
TEEGAN, Hugh, A. 2717 142nd Place, NE Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
AZIZ, Imran 2717 Western Avenue, 4010 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | ||
02 /
WONG, Kong-Kat 1206 243 Place SE Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | |||
03 /
TEEGAN, Hugh, A. 2717 142nd Place, NE Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | |||
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
AZIZ, Imran MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | ||
02 /
WONG, Kong-Kat MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | |||
03 /
TEEGAN, Hugh MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04779274.2 | 27.07.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US24141 | Priority number, date | US20030742696 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 742696 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005067432 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1623379 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (KR);
G06Q10/0633 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSFLUSSDIENSTEARCHITEKTUR | [2006/06] | English: | WORKFLOW SERVICES ARCHITECTURE | [2006/06] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE SERVICES DE GESTION DE FLUX DE TRAVAUX | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.05.2014 | 27.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/46] | 06.07.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US2004103014 (TEEGAN HUGH A [US], et al) [PX] 1-36 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 2 *; | [X] - HANDYSOFT CORP., "BizFlow Features and Benefits", INTERNET ARTICLE, (200306), URL: http://www.databaserepublic.com/downloads/files/bizflow_br_benefits.pdf, (20080212), XP002468672 [X] 1-36 * page 2 - page 6 * * page 9 - page 11 * | [X] - JIE MENG ET AL, "Flexible inter-enterprise workflow management using e-services", ADVANCED ISSUES OF E-COMMERCE AND WEB-BASED INFORMATION SYSTEMS, 2002. (WECWIS 2002). PROCEEDINGS. FOURTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON 26-28 JUNE 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020626), ISBN 0-7695-1567-3, pages 36 - 43, XP010595206 [X] 1-36 * the whole document * | [X] - HOLLINGSWORTH D, "Workflow Management Coalition, The Workflow Reference Model", INTERNET CITATION, (19950119), URL: http://www.wfmc.org/standards/docs/tc003v11.pdf, (20021029), XP002218704 [X] 1-36 * page 7 - page 10 * * page 12 - page 15 * * figure 5 * | [A] - GRAHAM, STEVE ET AL, Building Web Services with Java?: Making Sense of XML, SOAP, WSDL, and UDDI, SAMS, (20011212), ISBN 0-672-32181-5, XP002468674 [A] 1-36 * excerpt: Chapter 1. Web Services Overview * | [A] - VAN DER AALST ET AL, "Business Process Management: A Survey", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BUSINESS PROCESS MANAGEMENT, BPM 2003, ISBN 978-3-540-40318-0, (200306), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/579893.html, (20080112), XP002468673 [A] 1-36 | International search | [X]US5216592 (MANN GEORGE R [US], et al); | [X]US6594636 (SAKAGUCHI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [AP]US6678714 (OLAPURATH JOHN [US], et al); | [XE]US6832202 (SCHUYLER PAULA D [US], et al); | [Y] - WONG W. ET AL, "Sunchanges tune in support of SOAP protocol.", 07 JUNI 2000, (20050415), URL: http://news.com/Sun+changes+tune+in+support+of+SOAP+protocol/2100-1001_3-241568.html, XP002989143 |