EP1654295 - COPOLYMERS COMPRISING BRANCHED OLEFIN AND VINYL ETHER UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/19] | COPOLYMERS COMPRISING BRANCHED OLEFIN AND VINYL ETHER UNITS | ||
[2008/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS LOWELL One University Avenue Lowell, MA 01854 / US | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUST, Rudolf 580 Concord Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Younghua 70 Wannalancit St. Lowell, MA 01854 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04779627.1 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US24624 | Priority number, date | US20030491460P | 31.07.2003 Original published format: US 491460 P | US20040902280 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: US 902280 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012373 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1654295 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1654295 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/10, C08F216/12, C08F297/00, C08F8/12, C08F216/06 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
C08F216/12 (EP,US);
C08F297/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/10, C08F216/14, C08F216/14, C08F2500/03 (EP,US);
C08F210/10, C08F216/14, C08F2500/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | 24.02.2006 | HR | 24.02.2006 | LT | 24.02.2006 | LV | 24.02.2006 | MK | 24.02.2006 | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE MIT VERZWEIGTEN OLEFINEINHEITEN UND VINYLETHEREINHEITEN | [2006/19] | English: | COPOLYMERS COMPRISING BRANCHED OLEFIN AND VINYL ETHER UNITS | [2008/19] | French: | COPOLYMERES COMPORTANT DES UNITES OLEFINE RAMIFIEE ET DES UNITES ETHER VINYLIQUE | [2006/19] |
Former [2006/19] | COPOLYMERS COMPRISING BRANCHED OLEFIN AND VINYL ETHER UNITS | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 24.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | BE | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | PL | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | LU | 30.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
LU | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
LU | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X] - RUTH, WILLIAM G. ET AL, "Synthesis of poly(tert-butyldimethylsilyl vinyl ether) block copolymers using silyl aldol polymerization", POLYMER PREPRINTS (AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DIVISION OF POLYMER CHEMISTRY) , 34(2), 584-5 CODEN: ACPPAY; ISSN: 0032-3934, (1993), XP009040674 [X] 1-61 * the whole document * | [X] - ZHOU, YONGHUA; FAUST, RUDOLF, "Synthesis of poly(isobutylene-b-tert.-butyl vinyl ether) and poly(isobutylene-b-tert.-butyldimethylsilyl vinyl ether) diblock copolymers", POLYMER PREPRINTS (AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DIVISION OF POLYMER CHEMISTRY) , 44(2), 661-662 CODEN: ACPPAY; ISSN: 0032-3934, (2003), XP009040666 [X] 1-61 * the whole document * | [X] - RUTH; BRITTAINS, "Silicon-mediated synthesis of new amphiphilic oligomers", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, PART A CHEMISTRY, (19970115), vol. 35, pages 163 - 170, XP002308518 [X] 1-61 * page 168, column 2; figure 1 * | [X] - HADJIKYRIACOU S ET AL, "LIVING CATIONIC HOMOPOLYMERIZATION OF ISOBUTYL VINYL ETHER AND SEQUENTIAL BLOCK COPOLYMERIZATION OF ISOBUTYLENE WITH ISOBUTYL VINYL ETHER. SYNTHESIS AND MECHANISTIC STUDIES", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19951106), vol. 28, no. 23, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 7893 - 7900, XP000536361 [X] 1 * page 7894, column 1 * * page 7896, column 1; figures 8,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00127a041 |