EP1649065 - METHODS FOR AMPLIFYING POLYMERIC NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEGRATED DNA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1710 Commercial Park Coralville Iowa 52241 / US | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHLKE, Mark, Aaron 2185 Port Talbot Pl. Coralville, IA 52241 / US | 02 /
WALDER, Joseph, Alan 2709 W. Sherwin Chicago, IL 60645 / US | 03 /
MANTHEY, Jeffrey, A. 3004 Radcliffe Ave. Iowa City, IA 52245 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04779936.6 | 02.08.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US25016 | Priority number, date | US20030492120P | 01.08.2003 Original published format: US 492120 P | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005012499 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1649065 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649065 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6848 (EP);
C12Q1/6853 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2549/119, C12Q2531/101, C12Q2525/121 (EP);
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2549/119, C12Q2531/101, C12Q2525/186 (EP);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2549/119, C12Q2531/101, C12Q2525/186 (EP);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2549/119, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2525/121 (EP) |
Former IPC [2006/17] | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AMPLIFIKATION POLYMERER NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2006/17] | English: | METHODS FOR AMPLIFYING POLYMERIC NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2006/17] | French: | METHODES D'AMPLIFICATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 10.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2010 | BE | 03.03.2010 | CY | 03.03.2010 | CZ | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IT | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | PL | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | ES | 14.06.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | IE | 02.08.2010 | LU | 02.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 02.08.2010 | ||
LU | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 03.03.2010 | |
SI | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0164952 (MOLECULAR STAGING INC [US]); | [PA]WO03074724 (INTEGRATED DNA TECH INC [US], et al) [PA] * page 23; table 3 * * page 44 - page 45 *; | [PA]US2003228596 (LIU QIANG [US], et al) [PA] * example 7; claims 11,12 *; | [A] - STUMP M D ET AL, "THE USE OF MODIFIED PRIMERS TO ELIMINATE CYCLE SEQUENCING ARTIFACTS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1999), vol. 27, no. 23, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4642 - 4648, XP002907613 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.23.4642 | International search | [Y]US6093807 (BALOW GUITY P [US], et al); | [Y]US6335184 (REYES ANTONIO AREVALO [US], et al) | by applicant | US6335184 | - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 47, pages 31 - 40 | - PAO ET AL., MOL. CELL PROBES, (1993), vol. 7, pages 217 - 9 | - WALDER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 229 - 43 | - LONGO ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 93, pages 125 - 8 |