EP1654461 - PORTABLE AIR COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRASHEARS, Richard, K. 13707 Cripplegate Road Phoenix, MD 21131 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | Bell, Ian Stephen Black & Decker, Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04780066.9 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US25165 | Priority number, date | US20030493231P | 07.08.2003 Original published format: US 493231 P | US20040909945 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 909945 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005017355 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1654461 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1654461 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/00, B25C1/04 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
B25H3/006 (EP,US);
F04B35/04 (EP,US);
F04B41/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/19] | F04B53/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARER LUFTKOMPRESSOR | [2006/19] | English: | PORTABLE AIR COMPRESSOR | [2006/19] | French: | COMPRESSEUR D'AIR PORTABLE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | PL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1579897 (BECKER AB WILHEIM) [Y] 12,13 * page 1, line 9 - line 16 * * page 2, line 101 - page 3, line 7 *; | [A]US4662551 (DUDLEY LYNN A [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11,14,20 * column 1, line 5 - line 68 * * column 3, line 41 - column 9, line 28 ** figure 1 *; | [X]GB2216960 (ALLTRADE INC [US]) [X] 1,8,9,14,15,20 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 4 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5147182 (TIMMONS ROBERT D [US]) [Y] 7,8,18,19 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 1, line 32 - line 33 * * "portable compressor" * * column 4, line 17 - line 37 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6094773 (KRENTZ DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [X] 14,15,20 * column 1, line 6 - line 16 * * column 5, line 11 - line 16 * * figure 3 *; | [XY]WO0124941 (MI OK PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,14-16,20 * page 1, line 3 - line 9 * * page 1, line 23 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 10 * * figures 1,3,6 * [Y] 7,8,12,13,18,19 | International search | [Y]US4389166 (HARVEY GERALD J, et al); | [X]US5211558 (BAILEY JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]EP0595459 (MANGAR AIDS LTD [GB]); | [A]US2002158102 (PATTON JAMES ANDREW [US], et al); | [EA]US2004047745 (BURKHOLDER ROBERT F [US], et al); | [EA]US2004125609 (GILLIGAN JAMES [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0124941 |