EP1660157 - COSMETIC BANDAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Price, James 5624 Widmer Shawnee, Kansas 66216 / US | For all designated states Philipp, Timothy P. 3801 McKelvey Road, Suite 200 Bridgeton, Missouri 63004 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780419.0 | 06.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US25579 | Priority number, date | US20030493169P | 07.08.2003 Original published format: US 493169 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005014085 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660157 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A61F13/0203 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00153 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00182 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00378 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00561 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00846 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | A61M5/158 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHER VERBAND | [2006/22] | English: | COSMETIC BANDAGE | [2006/22] | French: | BANDAGE COSMETIQUE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4030465 (RUSCHKE MONA [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1,4 * * figures 6,9 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]US5501661 (CARTMELL JAMES V [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claim 1 ** column 3, line 17 - line 20 *; | [XP]WO2004064879 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1-9 * claims 1,8 * * page 3, line 22 * * page 13, line 14 - line 15 * * page 13, line 23 - line 25 * | International search | [Y]US2905174 (SMITH CLIFFORD W); | [Y]US3687136 (CARMODY DEWEY BLAIN); | [Y]US5120325 (DOW JR JAMES E [US]) |