EP1668497 - DATA STORAGE SYSTEM HAVING SHARED RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMC CORPORATION 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTON, John, K. 22 King Philip Path Mendon, MA 01756 / US | 02 /
BAXTER, William, F., III 273 Hollis Street Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 03 /
CHILTON, Kendell, A. 12 Wolfpen Lane Southborough, MA 01772 / US | 04 /
CASTEL, Daniel 150 Beacon Street Apt. 4 Boston, MA 02116 / US | 05 /
BERMINGHAM, Michael 453 Brook Street Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 06 /
GUYER, James, M. 40 Woodstone Road Northborough, MA 01532 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780567.6 | 02.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US25754 | Priority number, date | US20030675040 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 675040 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005036400 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668497 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F11/20 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
H04L49/3009 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
G06F11/1666 (EP,US);
H04L49/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHERSYSTEM MIT GEMEINSAM BENUTZTEM BETRIEBSMITTEL | [2006/24] | English: | DATA STORAGE SYSTEM HAVING SHARED RESOURCE | [2006/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES AVEC RESSOURCE PARTAGEE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2010 | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/06] | 03.10.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 14.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003037282 (BERG JERRY [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO03036493 (CHAPARRAL NETWORK STORAGE INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 9, lines 17-26 * * page 10, lines 28-31 * * page 11, lines 5-7 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 10 * * figures 2-11 *; | [Y]US6389494 (WALTON JOHN K [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, lines 50-58 * * column 3, lines 57-65 * * column 5, lines 45-55 * * figures 2-7 *; | [A]US2003145130 (SCHULTZ STEPHEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US5790775 (MARKS RANDAL S [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 50 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0632379 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 19 * * page 6, lines 36-40 * * page 7, lines 50-58 * * page 8, lines 8-12 * | Examination | US5884098 |