EP1670406 - COMPOSITE OUTER COVERS ADAPTED TO ATTAIN 3-D CONFIGURATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEHNER, Georgia, L. 8232 County Road T Larsen, Wisconsin 54947 / US | 02 /
UITENBROEK, Duane, G. 123 Homewood Court Little Chute, Wisconsin 54140 / US | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781192.2 | 16.08.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004US26466 | Priority number, date | US20030680967 | 07.10.2003 Original published format: US 680967 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039469 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670406 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
A61F13/49019 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/4902 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/51476 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/02] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPOSIT-AUSSENBESCHICHTUNGEN, DIE DREIDIMENSIONALE KONFIGURATIONEN ANNEHMEN KÖNNEN | [2006/25] | English: | COMPOSITE OUTER COVERS ADAPTED TO ATTAIN 3-D CONFIGURATIONS | [2006/25] | French: | REVETEMENTS EXTERIEURS COMPOSITES PREVUS POUR ADOPTER DES CONFIGURATIONS 3D | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003088228 (DESAI FRED NAVAL [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0073] , [0060] - [0066] - [0031]; claims 1,18 *; | [X]US2003111166 (UITENBROEK DUANE GIRARD [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0069] , [0049] , [0050] , [0036]; claims 1,4-8 * |