EP1660376 - MOLDED PLASTIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graham Packaging PET Technologies Inc. 2401 Pleasant Valley Road York, PA 17402 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMPSON, Charles, P., Jr. 1001 Willow Ridge Drive York, PA 17404 / US | 02 /
GUERIN, Stephen, R. 19 Oakland Drive Milford, NH 03055 / US | 03 /
PICCIOLI, David, P. 142 Spruce Lane Auburn, NH 03032 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Qiuchen, Peter 290 Blue Jacket Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2006/31] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
SIMPSON, Charles, P., Jr. 4785 Basin Adrian, MI 49221 / US | ||
02 /
GUERIN, Stephen, R. 19 Oakland Drive Milford, NH 03055 / US | |||
03 /
PICCIOLI, David, P. 142 Spruce Lane Auburn, NH 03032 / US | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Qiuchen, Peter 290 Blue Jacket Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781228.4 | 13.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US26507 | Priority number, date | US20030643217 | 14.08.2003 Original published format: US 643217 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016769 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660376 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B65D1/0284 (EP,US);
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B65D1/023 (EP,US);
B65D23/102 (EP,US);
B65D23/104 (EP,US);
B65D79/0084 (EP,US);
B65D2501/0036 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFORMTER KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [2006/22] | English: | MOLDED PLASTIC CONTAINER | [2006/22] | French: | RECIPIENT PLASTIQUE MOULE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2006 | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5678711 (TOBIAS JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO9957021 (CROWN CORK & SEAL TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-10* page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US2003000912 (DEUBEL DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 20 - page 2, paragraph 21; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-10; | [A]US6585125 (PEEK WILLIAM JEROME [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-3 * |