EP1658650 - FORMING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE LAYERS BY INK PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Charles, Chester 1700 Harris Road Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 02 /
BURBERRY, Mitchell, Stewart 299 Maidstone Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | 03 /
LELENTAL, Mark 259 Panorama Trail Rochester, NY 14625 / US | 04 /
WANG, Yongcai 135 Guy Grace Lane Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak SA Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2006/21] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited, Patent Department, Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781300.1 | 16.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004US26586 | Priority number, date | US20030648420 | 26.08.2003 Original published format: US 648420 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005022665 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658650 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658650 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
H05K3/02 (EP,US);
H10K71/211 (EP,US);
H10K71/60 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0329 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1163 (EP,US);
H10K85/1135 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US);
Y10T428/273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | H01L51/40, H01B1/12 | Designated contracting states | DE [2006/48] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER SCHICHTEN DURCH FARBSTOFFDRUCK | [2006/21] | English: | FORMING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE LAYERS BY INK PRINTING | [2006/21] | French: | FORMATION DE ZONES ELECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICES EN POLYMERE ORGANIQUE PAR L'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE SUR CELLES-CI D'UN AGENT AMELIORANT LA CONDUCTIVITE | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2008 | 15.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0686662 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP1003179 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]); | [XY]WO0120691 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]US2002158295 (ARMGARTH MARTEN [SE], et al); | [X]WO03067680 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [XY]WO03067333 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) | by applicant | US4070189 | US4731408 | US4987042 | US5093439 | US5300575 | US5312681 | US5354613 | US5370981 | US5372924 | US5391472 | US5403467 | US5443944 | US5575898 | US5665498 | US5674654 | US5716550 |