EP1658658 - A FLEXIBLE FLAT CABLE TERMINATION STRUCTURE FOR A CLOCKSPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METHODE ELECTRONICS, Inc. 7401 West Wilson Avenue Chicago Illinois 60706-4548 / US | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLEN, Pat 333 N. Lincoln Street Carthage, IL 62321 / US | 02 /
HENDERSON, Brent, E. 203 Ash Street Usra, IL 62376 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781332.4 | 17.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004US26621 | Priority number, date | US20030497563P | 26.08.2003 Original published format: US 497563 P | US20030721168 | 26.11.2003 Original published format: US 721168 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005021862 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658658 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
H01R35/02 (EP,US);
H01R12/592 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K1/118 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10189 (EP,US);
H05K3/3421 (EP,US);
H05K3/3447 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHLUSSKÖRPER DES FLEXIBLEN BANDKABELS FÜR SCHLEIFKONTAKTFEDER | [2006/21] | English: | A FLEXIBLE FLAT CABLE TERMINATION STRUCTURE FOR A CLOCKSPRING | [2006/21] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TERMINAISON DE CABLE PLAT ET SOUPLE DESTINEE A UN RESSORT SPIRALE | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1188520 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [Y] 5,9* page 1, line 44 - page 2, line 14 *; | [XY]EP0437642 (PETRI AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * column 2, line 1 - line 46 * [Y] 4,8; | [Y]US5348490 (SCHAUER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 4,8 * column 3, line 39 - line 50 *; | [XY]EP1235313 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0093] * [Y] 5,9 | International search | [A]US5194010 (DAMBACH PHILIP J [US], et al); | [A]US5230713 (SCHAUER FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [A]US5735697 (MUZSLAY STEVEN ZOLTAN [US]); | [A]US6032359 (CARROLL KEITH C [CA]); | [A]US6299466 (BOLEN PATRICK A [US], et al) |