Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1658658
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.08.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
16.04.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.09.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
01.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
17.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
07.04.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
22.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|