Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006089012 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49756303 | 26.08.2003 | US26732705 | 07.11.2005 | US72116803 | 26.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007503694 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US49756303 | 26.08.2003 | WO2004US26621 | 17.08.2004 | US72116803 | 26.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1658658 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2008 | A4 | EP1658658 | 24.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US49756303 | 26.08.2003 | WO2004US26621 | 17.08.2004 | US72116803 | 26.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005021862 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2005 | A3 | WO2005021862 | 10.03.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US49756303 | 26.08.2003 | US72116803 | 26.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7381064 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2008 | B2 | US2005048809 | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49756303 | 26.08.2003 | US72116803 | 26.11.2003 |