EP1664173 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE ACETALDEHYDE LEVEL IN POLYESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARSON, Jason, Clay 116 Pickens Court Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
WEAVER, Max, Allen 125 Hill Road Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 03 /
CYR, Michael, John 2034 Pembroke Bay Drive League City, TX 77573 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04781359.7 | 18.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US26649 | Priority number, date | US20030659225 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: US 659225 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026248 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664173 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664173 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/20, C08K5/34, C08K5/315, C08K5/45, C08K5/15, C08K5/41, C08K5/46, C08K5/39, C08K5/07 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08K5/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/315 (EP,US);
C08K5/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0008, C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES ACETALDEHYDGEHALTS IN POLYESTERN | [2006/23] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE ACETALDEHYDE LEVEL IN POLYESTERS | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DU NIVEAU D'ACETALDEHYDE DANS DES POLYESTERS | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2008 | CY | 11.06.2008 | CZ | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | PL | 11.06.2008 | RO | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | IE | 18.08.2008 | IT | 18.08.2008 | LU | 18.08.2008 | ES | 19.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | FR | 01.09.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | GB | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | NL | 01.03.2009 | DE | 03.03.2009 | [2011/47] |
Former [2010/51] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CY | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
TR | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
LU | 18.08.2008 | ||
ES | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
GB | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CY | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
TR | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
LU | 18.08.2008 | ||
ES | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
GB | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CY | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
LU | 18.08.2008 | ||
ES | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
GB | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
LU | 18.08.2008 | ||
ES | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
GB | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
ES | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
GB | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
GB | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
IT | 18.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
DE | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0241354 ; | [X]JPS5773049 ; | [X]JPH0260956 ; | [X]JPH0238445 ; | [A]JPH03241357 ; | [A]JPH10237444 ; | [X]US3177101 (VRIESEN CALVIN W) [X] 12 * column 3, line 52 - line 53 * * examples 2-4 *; | [A]GB1023213 (OMEGA CHEMICALS CORP) [A] 5 * page 8, line 16 - line 21 *; | [X]FR2502162 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) [X] 4,6-11 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 5 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 2; claim - *; | [A]US4362829 (COOPER STEPHEN M, et al) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0302289 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [X] 4* page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 4; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0400936 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [X] 4 * page 3, line 1 - line 22 * * page 5, line 10 *; | [A]US5663029 (MALHOTRA SHADI L [CA]) [A] 5 * column 5, line 31 - line 49 * * column 7, line 19 - line 35 * * column 9, line 2 *; | [X]FR2764607 (RHONE POULENC FIBRES & POLYMER [FR]) [X] 4-11,13 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 32 * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 24; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO0059993 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 12 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 11 * * examples 2-10; table 2 *; | [A]EP1110999 (GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL EUROP [CH]) [A] 5 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 20; example -; claim - * * page 40, line 9 - line 12 *; | [X]US2003113568 (MURSCHALL URSULA [DE], et al) [X] 4 * page 1, paragraph 14 - paragraph 16 * * page 2, paragraph 33 - page 3, paragraph 35 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 12, Database accession no. 1990-087763, XP002306052 & JPH0241354 A 19900209 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 4,6-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 24, Database accession no. 1982-48951E, XP002306053 & JPS5773049 A 19820507 (ADEKA ARGUS IND KK) [X] 4,6-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 15, Database accession no. 1990-111204, XP002306054 & JPH0260956 A 19900301 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 4,6-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 12, Database accession no. 1990-086462, XP002306055 & JPH0238445 A 19900207 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 4,6-11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 49, Database accession no. 1991-358685, XP002306056 & JPH03241357 A 19911028 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [A] 5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 46, Database accession no. 1998-537769, XP002306057 & JPH10237444 A 19980908 (AICELLO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * |