EP1660259 - COMPOSITION FOR POWDER METALLURGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apex Advanced Technologies, LLC 4650 Spring Road Cleveland, OH 44131 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMOND, Dennis, L. 4278 Hart Road Richfield, OH 44286 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04782816.5 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US28400 | Priority number, date | US20030499769P | 03.09.2003 Original published format: US 499769 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023463 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660259 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F3/12 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F1/148 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F1/148, B22F3/02, B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/09, B22F1/10, B22F1/148 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/148, B22F1/09, B22F1/10 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR PULVERMETALLURGIE | [2006/22] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR POWDER METALLURGY | [2006/22] | French: | COMPOSITION A UTILISER DANS LE DOMAINE DE LA METALLURGIE DES POUDRES | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3846126 (ROGERS H, et al); | [X]US6334882 (AASLUND CHRISTER [SE]); | [Y]US6348081 (HORATA AKIRA [JP], et al) |