EP1660807 - ROTARY CAM VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRSEP CORPORATION 401 Creekside Drive Buffalo, NY 14228-2085 / US | For all designated states McCombs, Norman R. 109 Millwood Drive Tonawanda, NY 14150 / US | For all designated states Casey, Robert E. 649 W. Ferry Street Buffalo, NY 14222 / US | For all designated states Bosinski, Robert 223 Pellman Place West Seneca, NY 14218 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCOMBS, Norman, R. 109 Millwood Drive Tonawanda, NY 14150 / US | 02 /
CASEY, Robert, E. 649 W. Ferry Street Buffalo, NY 14222 / US | 03 /
BOSINSKI, Robert 223 Pellman Place West Seneca, NY 14218 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04782866.0 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US28451 | Priority number, date | US20030499542P | 02.09.2003 Original published format: US 499542 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005022014 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660807 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F17D3/00, F16K11/16, F16K11/14, F16K31/524 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
F16K11/166 (EP,US);
F16K11/14 (EP,US);
F16K31/52416 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86445 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87217 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | F17D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHNOCKENVENTIL | [2006/22] | English: | ROTARY CAM VALVE | [2006/22] | French: | SOUPAPE A CAME ROTATIVE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 05.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB603782 (PESCO PRODUCTS CO) [X] 1-8 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2545529 (OBECNY JOHN T) [X] 1-8* figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2783775 (FULLWOOD EDWARD F) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-11 *; | [X]FR1332578 (GAUBAN ETS) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-11 *; | [X]US3353554 (LUDKIN BASIL A) [X] 1-8 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0520147 (GRAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US6558451 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US], et al); | [A]US5117870 (GOODALE DAVID L [US], et al); | [A]US4744285 (PRESLEY GLEN T [US]) |