EP1660603 - RELEASABLE ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2011 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKADA, Yoichi 8-1-1 Minami-Hashimoto 3 chome Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa 229-1185 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO, Eiji 8-8, Minami-Hashimoto 3 chome Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa 229-1185 / JP | 03 /
RYU, Hideki 8-8, Minami-Hashimoto 3-chome Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa 229-1185 / JP | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04783003.9 | 02.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US28617 | Priority number, date | JP20030314221 | 05.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003314221 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026280 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660603 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
C09J7/20 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J2301/16 (KR);
C09J2301/18 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/308 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERABLÖSBARES KLEBEBAND | [2006/22] | English: | RELEASABLE ADHESIVE TAPE | [2006/22] | French: | BANDE ADHESIVE DECOLLABLE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 02.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0925460 ; | [X]US4647485 (NELSON ROY E [US]) [X] 1-6 * figure - * * column 2, line 18 - line 49 *; | [X]EP0696628 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP1077242 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * claim 1 * * figure IX * * examples V.03-PSA-2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09025460 A 19970128 (YAMAMOTO KOGYOSHO:KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |