EP1729655 - SHORT TERM POST SURGICAL CAVITY TREATMENT DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rubicor Medical, Inc. 849 Veterans Boulevard Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERNOMORSKY, Ary, S. 900 Placer Rider Rd. Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | 02 /
VETTER, James, W. 117 Solana Rd. Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 03 /
TUTTLE, Jordan, S. 117 Solana Rd. Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Chapple, Colin Richard, et al Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Chapple, Colin Richard, et al 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783243.1 | 03.09.2004 | [2006/50] | WO2004US28931 | Priority number, date | US20030500069P | 03.09.2003 Original published format: US 500069 P | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005067442 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729655 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00, A61M31/00, // A61M25/00, A61B19/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61M25/1002 (EP);
A61N5/1015 (EP);
A61B2017/320048 (EP);
A61B2090/3908 (EP);
A61B90/02 (EP);
A61M2025/1075 (EP);
A61M2025/1084 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | A61M29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/50] | A61B17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR KURZFRISTIGEN POSTOPERATIVEN BEHANDLUNG VON KÖRPERHÖHLEN | [2006/50] | English: | SHORT TERM POST SURGICAL CAVITY TREATMENT DEVICES AND METHODS | [2006/50] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE CAVITES POST CHIRURGICALES COURT TERME | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0457456 (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 31,32 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 18 ** column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 9; figures 1-3,5E; claims 1-12 *; | [X]US5112303 (PUDENZ ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 23,30,35 * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 12 * * column 2, line 13 - column 2, line 30 * * column 3, line 24 - column 3, line 41 * * column 4, line 26 - column 7, line 5; figures 1-5; claims 1-3 *; | [YA]US5931774 (WILLIAMS JEFFERY A [US], et al) [Y] 34 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 8 * * column 1 * * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 13; figure 2 * [A] 1; | [XY]US2002082556 (CIOANTA IULIAN [US], et al) [X] 23,26-30,35 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 3, paragraph 26 * * page 4, paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraph 36 * * page 7, paragraph 74; figures 2,3A-3T,4A-4F * * page 7, paragraph 80 - page 8, paragraph 81 * * page 12, paragraph 117 - page 12, paragraph 120; figure 11A * * page 13, line 124 * * page 13, paragraph 128 - page 14, paragraph 130; claims 1-24 * [Y] 34; | [XA]US2003114793 (FREYMAN TOBY [US]) [X] 23 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 2, paragraph 27; figures 1,2 * * page 3, paragraph 31; figure 5 * * page 4, paragraph 41 - page 4, paragraph 42; figures 8,9 * [A] 34 | International search | [XP]US2004087827 ; | [X]US5797877 |