EP1661062 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOMETRIC IDENTIFICATION USING HANDWRITING RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gannon Technologies Group 1000 North Payne Street Alexandria, VA 22314 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALCH, Mark A. 1000 North Payne Street Alexandria, VA 22314 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783375.1 | 07.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US29091 | Priority number, date | US20030500498P | 05.09.2003 Original published format: US 500498 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005024711 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661062 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/18 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
G06V40/33 (EP,US);
G06V30/18 (EP,US);
G06V40/30 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BIOMETRISCHEN IDENTIFIKATION DURCH VERWENDUNG VON HANDSCHRIFTERKENNUNG | [2006/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOMETRIC IDENTIFICATION USING HANDWRITING RECOGNITION | [2006/22] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES D'IDENTIFICATION BIOMETRIQUE PAR LA RECONNAISSANCE DE L'ECRITURE MANUSCRITE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 25.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/37] | 08.05.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2014 | 09.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2013 | 30.09.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5142589 (LOUGHEED ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 3-9 * abstract *; | [Y] - SAGAR V K ET AL, "Slant manipulation and character segmentation for forensic document examination", TENCON '96. PROCEEDINGS., 1996 IEEE TENCON. DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS PERTH, WA, AUSTRALIA 26-29 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961126), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-3679-7, pages 933 - 938, XP010236807 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1996.608473 | [Y] - GREENING C M ET AL, "An image processing and pattern recognition framework for forensic document analysis", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, 1995. PROCEEDINGS. INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND EL ECTRONICS ENGINEERS 29TH ANNUAL 1995 INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON SANDERSTEAD, UK 18-20 OCT. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19951018), ISBN 978-0-7803-2627-9, pages 295 - 300, XP010196428 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1995.524926 | [A] - STEINKE K, "RECOGNITION OF WRITERS BY HANDWRITING IMAGES", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (19810101), vol. 14, no. 1 - 06, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 357 - 364, XP000619362 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(81)90080-7 | [A] - YAMAZAKI Y ET AL, "EXTRACTION OF PERSONAL FEATURES FROM ON-LINE HANDWRITING INFORMATION IN CONTEXT-INDEPENDENT CHARACTERS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS,COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, ENGINEERING SCIENCES SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20001001), vol. E83-A, no. 10, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 1955 - 1962, XP000975370 [A] 13 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5559895 (LEE LUAN L [US], et al); | [Y]US5923793 (IKEBATA YOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [Y]US5930380 (KASHI RAMANUJAN S [US], et al); | [Y]US6445820 (LOVE PATRICK B [US]); | [X] - DEHGHAN M., "Signature verification using vhape vescriptors and multiple neural networks", IEEE TENCON '97, (19971202), vol. 1, pages 415 - 418, XP010264236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1997.647344 | Examination | - DOERMANN D S ET AL, "RECOVERY OF TEMPORAL INFORMATION FROM STATIC IMAGES OF HANDWRITING", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NORWELL, US, (19950601), vol. 15, no. 1/02, doi:10.1007/BF01450853, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 143 - 164, XP000499552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01450853 | - KATO Y ET AL, "RECOVERY OF DRAWING ORDER FROM SINGLE-STROKE HANDWRITING IMAGES", TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, USA, (20000901), vol. 22, no. 9, doi:10.1109/34.877517, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 938 - 949, XP000976476 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.877517 | by applicant | - SAGAR V.K. ET AL., "Slant manipulation and character segmentation for forensic document examination", TENCON PROCEEDINGS 1996 IEEE TENCON. DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS, (1996), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/TENCON.1996.608473, pages 933 - 938, XP010236807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1996.608473 | - GREENING C.M. ET AL., "An image processing and pattern recognition framework for forensic document analysis", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY PROCEEDINGS, IEEE 29TH ANNUAL INT. CARNAHAN CONF., (19951018), doi:doi:10.1109/CCST.1995.524926, pages 295 - 300, XP000585869 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1995.524926 |