23.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
23.09.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
09.09.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
28.03.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
03.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
19.04.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
15.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2012 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
16.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
06.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
28.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
21.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
21.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
31.07.2012 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.02.2011 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.05.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.01.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.01.2009 |
First examination report |
|
02.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
06.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
05.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
20.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|