EP1665617 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACKNOWLEDGING REVERSE LINK TRANSMISSIONS IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAAL, Peter 8304 Menkar Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04783523.6 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29305 | Priority number, date | US20030501555P | 08.09.2003 Original published format: US 501555 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005027397 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1665617 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1665617 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/08, H04B7/26 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H04J13/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04J13/0025 (EP,KR,US);
H04J13/0044 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1607 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTÄTIGUNG VON RÜCKWÄRTSSTRECKEN-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2006/23] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACKNOWLEDGING REVERSE LINK TRANSMISSIONS IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ACCUSE RECEPTION DE TRANSMISSIONS SUR LIAISON AVAL DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2004 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | IE | 08.09.2013 | LU | 08.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | SE | 13.03.2013 | |
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 13.03.2013 | |
BG | 13.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5577024 (MALKAMAKI ESA [FI], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 30 * * column 5, line 7 - line 44; figure 1 * * column 6, line 10 - line 62 *; | [A]US6091761 (POPOVIC BRANISLAV [SE]) [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15* column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 24 *; | [A] - NISHINAGA N ET AL, "Orthogonal M-ary spread spectrum system under carrier frequency offset", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS PROCEEDINGS, 1996., IEEE 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MAINZ, GERMANY 22-25 SEPT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960922), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3567-8, pages 214 - 218, XP010208654 [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15 * points 3, 3.1, 3.2 * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSTA.1996.563773 | [A] - DONELAN H ET AL, "Method for generating sets of orthogonal sequences", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19990902), vol. 35, no. 18, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1537 - 1538, XP006012622 [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19991046 |