EP1664374 - ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION METHODS OF FORMING SILICON DIOXIDE COMPRISING LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way MS 1-525 Boise, ID 83716 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, MS 1-525 Boise, ID 83716 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. 8000 South Federal Way, MS 1-525 Boise, ID 83716 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Li 5239 East Quarterpath Drive Boise, ID 83716 / US | 02 /
LI, Weimin 18 Qington Road 43-502 Pudong New Area / CN | 03 /
SANDHU, Gurtej, S. 2964 East Parkriver Drive Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
LI, Li 2790 North Oldstone Way Meridian, ID 83642 / US | ||
02 /
LI, Weimin 18 Qington Road 43-502 Pudong New Area / CN | |||
03 /
SANDHU, Gurtej, S. 2964 East Parkriver Drive Boise, ID 83706 / US | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783643.2 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29478 | Priority number, date | US20030669667 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 669667 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005033359 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1664374 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664374 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, C23C16/455, // C23C16/44 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
C23C16/45527 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/402 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45553 (KR);
H01L21/02164 (KR);
H01L21/02211 (KR);
H01L21/0228 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | C23C16/40, C23C16/455 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ATOMLAGENABSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG VON SILICIUMDIOXID ENTHALTENDEN SCHICHTEN | [2006/23] | English: | ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION METHODS OF FORMING SILICON DIOXIDE COMPRISING LAYERS | [2006/23] | French: | FORMATION DE COUCHES CONTENANT DU DIOXYDE DE SILICIUM PAR DES PROCEDES D'EPITAXIE EN COUCHES ATOMIQUES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2011 | BE | 01.06.2011 | CY | 01.06.2011 | CZ | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | EE | 01.06.2011 | FI | 01.06.2011 | HU | 01.06.2011 | IT | 01.06.2011 | NL | 01.06.2011 | PL | 01.06.2011 | RO | 01.06.2011 | SE | 01.06.2011 | SI | 01.06.2011 | SK | 01.06.2011 | TR | 01.06.2011 | BG | 01.09.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | IE | 08.09.2011 | LU | 08.09.2011 | ES | 12.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | PT | 03.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
LU | 08.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
LU | 08.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
LU | 08.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
BE | 01.06.2011 | ||
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1107302 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-49 * paragraph [0019]; figures 7,8; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]WO0166832 (ASM INC [US]) [A] 1-49 * page 8, line 26 - page 12, line 8; figure 7; claims 1-6,45 *; | [A]US2003064607 (LEU JIHPERNG [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; claims 1,5,6,14 *; | [A] - HIROYUKI SAKAUE, "DIGITAL CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION OF SIO2 USING A REPETITIVE REACTION OF TRIETHYLSILANE/HYDROGEN AND OXIDATION", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (19910115), vol. 30, no. 1B PART 2, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L124 - L127, XP000220250 [A] 1,21,38 * paragraph [02.2]; figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.30.L124 |