EP1664086 - CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATION OF THERAPEUTIC POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608-2912 / US | [2008/52] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608-2912 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIQUELME, Patricio T., Chiron Corporation P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 02 /
VICTA, Corazon Terciano, Chiron Corporation P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 03 /
CROSIER, Walter Joseph, Chiron Corporation P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 04 /
WENDELL, John Tharin, Chiron Corporation P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783837.0 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29774 | Priority number, date | US20030501610P | 09.09.2003 Original published format: US 501610 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023840 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664086 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664086 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/16 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHROMATOGRAPHISCHE AUFTRENNUNG THERAPEUTISCHER POLYPEPTIDE | [2006/23] | English: | CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATION OF THERAPEUTIC POLYPEPTIDES | [2006/23] | French: | SEPARATION CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE DE POLYPEPTIDES THERAPEUTIQUES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.12.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 28.10.2009 | |
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 28.10.2009 | |
SE | 28.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0529300 (BIOFERON BIOCHEM SUBSTANZ [DE]) [Y] 1-35* see p. 7, l. 18-38; claims *; | [X] - RUSSELL-HARDE D ET AL, "THE USE OF ZWITTERGENT 3-14 IN THE PURIFICATION OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN INTERFERON-BETA SER17 (BETASERON)", JOURNAL OF INTERFERON AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1995), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1079-9907, pages 31 - 37, XP008014279 [X] 1-35 * see Figure 2 * | [Y] - RUNKEL L ET AL, "Structural and Functional Differences Between Glycosylated and Non-glycosylated Forms of Human Interferon-Beta (IFN-Beta)", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1998), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 641 - 649, XP002271902 [Y] 1-35 * see abstract, p. 642, right col. sec. para., Fig. 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1011974512425 |