EP1662907 - INCORPORATION OF PHYTOSTEROLS INTO FLAVORINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa Health & Nutrition Americas, Inc 23700 Chagrin Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44122 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASSER, Albert, Anthony 7723 Shaker Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
YONG, Ruth 1505 Dixie Highway Parkhills, Kentucky 41011 / US | 03 /
HAMMERSCHMIDT, Lauren 6532 Brampton Abbey Morrow, Ohio 45215 / US | 04 /
STARTUP, William 892 Sabino Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45231 / US | 05 /
FAIROW, H., Clint 1111 County Road, 900 North Tolono, Illinois 61880 / US | 06 /
BISHOP, Mary 345 Warren Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45220 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783841.2 | 13.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29779 | Priority number, date | US20030504857P | 22.09.2003 Original published format: US 504857 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005032277 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662907 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A23L1/221, A23L1/226, A23L1/222 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A23L33/11 (EP,US);
A23L27/10 (EP,US);
A23L27/12 (EP,US);
A23L27/20 (EP,US);
A23L27/206 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINARBEITUNG VON PFLANZLICHEN STEROLEN IN GESCHMACKSTOFFE | [2006/23] | English: | INCORPORATION OF PHYTOSTEROLS INTO FLAVORINGS | [2006/23] | French: | INCORPORATION DE PHYTOSTEROLS DANS DES AROMATISANTS | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]CN1365619 ; | [Y]CN1423960 ; | [Y]CN1289564 ; | [Y]CN1289546 ; | [Y]CN1133137 ; | [Y]CN1119072 ; | [Y]CN1090971 ; | [Y]WO9858554 (CULTOR CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 24; examples 1-23; claims 1-27 *; | [X]WO9918811 (ITARA H K AB OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-24 * examples 3-5; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US6090432 (MCKEOWN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6129944 (TIAINEN ILKKA [FI], et al) [Y] 1-24 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 30; examples 1-22; claims 1-47 *; | [A]US6149961 (KEPPLINGER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 18* column 1, lines 38-48; example 3; claims 1-19 *; | [A]EP1142494 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0217892 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1; claims 1-21 * * page 11, paragraphs 2,3 *; | [Y]WO02100412 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 1; claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US2003068357 (VALA LISA A [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 3, paragraph 32; claims 1-20 *; | [PX]US2003232095 (GARTI NISSIM [IL], et al) [PX] 1-24 * claims 1-18 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 24, Database accession no. 2003-240337, XP002313557 & CN1365619 A 20020828 (XU C) [X] 21 * abstract * [Y] 1-20,22-24 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 77, Database accession no. 2003-814022, XP002313556 & CN1423960 A 20030618 (CHEN B) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 40, Database accession no. 2001-375713, XP002313558 & CN1289564 A 20010404 (LIU X) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 40, Database accession no. 2001-375698, XP002313559 & CN1289546 A 20010404 (LIU Y) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 02, Database accession no. 1998-009645, XP002313560 & CN1133137 A 19961016 (CHEN J) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 44, Database accession no. 1997-471499, XP002313561 & CN1119072 A 19960327 (QUAN W) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 15, Database accession no. 1997-154860, XP002313562 & CN1090971 A 19940824 (GAI Q) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * |