EP1687664 - MULTILAYER POLYMER GRADIENT INDEX (GRIN) LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baer, Eric 2 Mornington Lane Cleveland Hts., OH 44106 / US | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAER, Eric 2 Mornington Lane Cleveland Hts., OH 44106 / US | 02 /
HILTNER, Anne, P. 13615 Shaker Boulevard No. 4B Cleveland, OH 44120 / US | 03 /
SHIRK, James, S. 8316 Ashwood Drive Alexandria, VA 22308 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
BAER, Eric 2 Mornington Lane Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US | ||
02 /
HILTNER, Anne, P. 13615 Shaker Boulevard, 4B Cleveland, OH 44120 / US | |||
03 /
SHIRK, James, S. 8316 Ashwood Drive Alexandria, VA 22308 / US | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/38] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/32] | Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04784271.1 | 16.09.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004US30355 | Priority number, date | US20030519655P | 14.11.2003 Original published format: US 519655 P | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005057245 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1687664 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687664 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B9/00, G02B3/00, B29D11/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B29D11/00355 (EP,US);
G02B3/00 (KR);
B29D11/0073 (EP);
B29D11/00855 (EP);
G02B3/0087 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | G02B9/00, G02B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE POLYMERLINSEN MIT GRADIENTENINDEX (GRIN) | [2006/32] | English: | MULTILAYER POLYMER GRADIENT INDEX (GRIN) LENSES | [2006/32] | French: | LENTILLES POLYMERES MULTICOUCHES A GRADIENT D'INDICE (GRIN) | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2016 | 21.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2004 | AT | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | IE | 16.09.2016 | LU | 16.09.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.09.2004 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US4640585 (NOJIRI HIDETOSHI [JP]); | [A]US5689374 (XU XIAOJIE [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4657344 (BOEHM HEINZ [DE]); | [Y]US5044737 (BLANKENBECLER RICHARD [US]); | [A]US5689374 (XU XIAOJIE [US], et al); | [A]US6606199 (WANG TZU-YU [US]); | [YP]US2004042729 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al); | [YP]US2004105163 (BRYAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) | by applicant | US4460585 |