EP1663531 - ANTI-FOULING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NDSU Research Foundation Room 142, 1735 NDSU Research Park Drive Fargo, ND 58105 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUDJOUK, Philip 2114 7th St. N Fargo, North Dakota 58102 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, Johnson 114 Manchester Aurora, Ohio 44202 / US | 03 /
CHOI, Seok-Bong 5528 15th St. S Fargo, North Dakota 58104 / US | 04 /
READY, Thomas, E. 510 Argus Avenue Page, North Dakota 58064 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
BOUDJOUK, Philip 2114 7th St. N Fargo, North Dakota 58102 / US | ||
02 /
THOMAS, Johnson A19 University Village Fargo, North Dakota 58102 / US | |||
03 /
CHOI, Seok-Bong 5528 15th St. S Fargo, North Dakota 58104 / US | |||
04 /
READY, Thomas, E. 510 Argus Avenue Page, North Dakota 58064 / US | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04784830.4 | 23.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US31140 | Priority number, date | US20030506077P | 25.09.2003 Original published format: US 506077 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005030405 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663531 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, C09D183/04, B08B1/00, C08G77/442, C08F283/12 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C09D183/04 (EP);
C08F8/18 (EP);
C08G77/442 (EP);
C09D5/1668 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | B08B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÄULNIS VERHÜTENDE MATERIALIEN | [2006/23] | English: | ANTI-FOULING MATERIALS | [2006/23] | French: | MATERIAUX ANTISALISSURES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6413446 (MECHTEL MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 10-12* column 5, lines 40-49; claim 1 *; | [X]US2002098214 (ADAMS GERALD [GB], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0035] - [0049]; examples 1-8; claim 1 *; | [X]US6458878 (TSUBOI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 62; claims 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US6458878 |