EP1664783 - RAPID TEST FOR GLYCATED ALBUMIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPINEX DIAGNOSTIC, INC. 2815 McGraw Avenue Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states EPINEX DIAGNOSTIC, INC. 2815 McGaw Avenue Irvine, CA 92614 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Henry, J. 30088 Ynez Road Temecula, CA 92592 / US | 02 /
ZAIDI, Asad 13408 Randsberg Street Cerritos, CA 90703 / US | [2006/29] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
SMITH, Henry, J. 2083 East Washington Avenue San jacinto, CA 92583 / US | ||
02 /
ZAIDI, Asad 13408 Randsberg Street Cerritos, CA 90703 / US | Representative(s) | Thomas, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Thomas, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 04784881.7 | 22.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US31202 | Priority number, date | US20030505392P | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 505392 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031356 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664783 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664783 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/6842 (EP,US);
G01N33/54389 (US);
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N2333/765 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/973 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLTEST FÜR GLYKIERTES ALBUMIN | [2006/23] | English: | RAPID TEST FOR GLYCATED ALBUMIN | [2006/23] | French: | TEST RAPIDE POUR ALBUMINE GLYCATEE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | IE | 22.09.2011 | LU | 22.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.09.2011 | ||
LU | 22.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.09.2011 | ||
LU | 22.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.09.2011 | ||
LU | 22.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9534815 (GKS TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al); | [A]EP0724157 (BAYER AG [US]); | [X]WO9631619 (LXN CORP [US]); | [X]EP0769697 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]); | [YP]WO2004042364 (THERASENSE INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5962336 (SUN MING [US]); | [A]US5981298 (CHUDZIK STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [A]US6248598 (BOGEMA STUART C [US]) | Examination | EP0291194 |